SC H5157 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Effective date 05/03/18
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Effective date 05/03/18
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Clemson University - State Crop Pest Commission, Relating To Benghal Dayflower Quarantine; And Emerald Ash Borer Quarantine, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4807, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code
Title
State Crop Pest Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Effective date 05/03/18 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-01 | Ratified R 193 | |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-03-22 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-03-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-1 |
2018-03-21 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |