SC H5152 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Create The "equine Industry Support Measures Study Committee" To Examine The Potential For Further Growth Of The Equine Industry In This State And The Resulting Economic Impact.
Title
Equine Industry Support Measures Study Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-12 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-2 |
2020-05-12 | House | Read second time |
2020-05-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, R.Williams, Taylor, Ligon |
2020-04-08 | House | Debate adjourned |
2020-03-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |