SC H5149 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminate Five Voting Precincts, And To Update The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Saluda County Voting precincts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-19SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-02-14HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2020-02-13HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-02-13HouseRoll call Yeas-107 Nays-0
2020-02-13HouseRead second time
2020-02-13 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-02-12HouseIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77480(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback