SC H5140 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Act No. 281
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Act No. 281
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revise Various Assessments Used, Manner Of Procurement, Implementation, And Administration Of These Assessments, Among Other Things
Title
School opening
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Pope [R] | Rep. Raye Felder [R] | Rep. John King [D] | Sen. Michael Gambrell [R] |
Rep. Craig Gagnon [R] | Rep. Shannon Erickson [R] | Rep. Gary Clary [R] | Rep. Edward Tallon [R] |
Rep. Phyllis Henderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-15 - House - House: Adopt Free Conference Report (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House: Granting Free Conference Powers (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House: Granting Free Conference Powers (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | Act No. 281 | |
2016-06-27 | Effective date 06/22/16 | |
2016-06-22 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-17 | Ratified R 310 | |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-2 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Free conference report received and adopted |
2016-06-15 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-1 |
2016-06-15 | House | Free conference report adopted |
2016-06-15 | House | Free conference committee appointed Stringer, Felder, RL Brown |
2016-06-15 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2016-06-15 | House | Free conference powers granted |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Free conference committee appointed John Matthews, Hayes, Rankin |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Free conference powers granted |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Conference committee appointed John Matthews, Hayes, Rankin |
2016-06-02 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Stringer, Felder, RL Brown |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-0 Nays-42 |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2016-06-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-0 |
2016-06-01 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-21 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2016-04-20 | House | Read second time |
2016-04-20 | House | Amended |
2016-04-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gambrell, Gagnon, Erickson, Clary, Tallon, Henderson |
2016-04-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2016-04-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: King |
2016-03-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2016-03-23 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 425 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 25 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |