SC H5139 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-5)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Funderburk
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 23-9-197 So As To Establish The "firefighter Cancer Health Care Benefit Plan" To Provide A Supplemental Insurance Policy Upon A Firefighter Being Diagnosed With Cancer And To Set Forth The Benefits Contained In The Policy; And To Amend Sections 38-7-30 And 38-7-35, Relating To The Tax On Fire Insurers And The Expenditure Of The Tax, So As To Fund The Plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firefighter Cancer Health Care Benefit Plan

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Funderburk
2020-03-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Cox
2020-03-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McDaniel
2020-03-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry
2020-03-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
2020-02-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Allison, Forrester, W.Newton
2020-02-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Ridgeway, Clemmons, Magnuson, Haddon, Long, Chumley
2020-02-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McCravy, Hewitt, Daning, Murphy, Kimmons, Yow, B.Cox
2020-02-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor, Oremus, Blackwell, Hixon, Trantham, Henegan
2020-02-18HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin, D.C.Moss, V.S.Moss
2020-02-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Atkinson, Chellis
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2020-02-12HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S1071 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Signed By Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
239197(n/a)See Bill Text
38730(n/a)See Bill Text
38735(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback