SC H5103 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Committed to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Committed to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide The Rights Of A Pharmacy When Undergoing An Audit Conducted By A Managed Care Company, Insurance Company, Third-party Payer, Or An Entity Responsible For Payment Of Claims For Health Care Services; To Require The Auditing Entity To Establish An Appeals Process; And To Provide For The Recoupment Of Funds Under Certain Circumstances.
Title
Pharmacy Audit Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Committed to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2012-04-26 | Debate adjourned until Wed., 05-09-12 | |
2012-04-25 | Debate adjourned | |
2012-04-25 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Branham | |
2012-04-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-04-19 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2012-04-17 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brannon | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2012-03-29 | Recalled from Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs | |
2012-03-29 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S1269 (Similar To) 2012-06-27 - Act No. 250