SC H5098 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 80-44)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-14 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-14 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Express Profound Sorrow And Extend Deepest Sympathy To The People Of Oman In The Death Of Sultan Qaboos Bin Said, To Recognize And Honor Sultan Haitham Bin Tariq Al Said, Wish Him Success In His Future Endeavors As The Sultan Of Oman, And To Express Gratitude For And Hope To Continue The Strong Relationship Between The United States And Oman That Has Been In Place Since 1790.
Title
Sultan Qaboos Bin Said and Sultan Haitham Bin Tariq Al Said
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-02-05 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |