SC H5095 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 79-44)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognize And Honor The Many Sacrifices And Valuable Contributions The South Carolina National Guard Makes To Protect The Freedom, Democracy, And Security Of Our State And Nation And To Declare Tuesday, March 20, 2018, "national Guard Day" In South Carolina.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC National Guard

Sponsors

Rep. James Smith [D]Rep. Terry Alexander [D]Rep. Merita Allison [R]Rep. Carl Anderson [D]
Rep. Michael Anthony [D]Rep. Katherine Arrington [R]Rep. Frank Atkinson [D]Rep. Todd Atwater [R]
Rep. Jimmy Bales [D]Rep. Nathan Ballentine [R]Rep. Justin Bamberg [D]Rep. Bruce Bannister [R]
Rep. Linda Bennett [R]Rep. Beth Bernstein [D]Rep. Bart Blackwell [R]Rep. William Bowers [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Bradley [R]Rep. Wendy Brawley [D]Rep. Robert Brown [D]Rep. Bruce Bryant [R]
Rep. James Burns [R]Rep. Micajah Caskey [R]Rep. William Chumley [R]Rep. Gary Clary [R]
Rep. Alan Clemmons [R]Rep. William Clyburn [D]Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D]Rep. William Cogswell [R]
Rep. Derham Cole [R]Rep. Neal Collins [R]Rep. Heather Crawford [R]Rep. William Crosby [R]
Rep. Joseph Daning [R]Rep. Sylleste Davis [R]Rep. Gregory Delleney [R]Rep. Chandra Dillard [D]
Rep. MaryGail Douglas [D]Rep. Gregory Duckworth [R]Rep. Jason Elliott [R]Rep. Shannon Erickson [R]
Rep. Raye Felder [R]Rep. Kirkman Finlay [R]Rep. Cally Forrest [R]Rep. Michael Forrester [R]
Rep. Russell Fry [R]Rep. Laurie Funderburk [D]Rep. Craig Gagnon [R]Rep. Wendell Gilliard [D]
Rep. Jerry Govan [D]Rep. Daniel Hamilton [R]Rep. Kevin Hardee [R]Rep. Christopher Hart [D]
Rep. Jackie Hayes [D]Rep. Phyllis Henderson [R]Rep. Rosalyn Henderson-Myers [D]Rep. Patricia Henegan [D]
Rep. William Herbkersman [R]Rep. William Hewitt [R]Rep. Jonathon Hill [R]Rep. Davey Hiott [R]
Rep. William Hixon [R]Rep. Lonnie Hosey [D]Rep. Leon Howard [D]Rep. Chip Huggins [R]
Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D]Rep. Jeffrey Johnson [R]Rep. Wallace Jordan [R]Rep. John King [D]
Rep. Roger Kirby [D]Rep. Patsy Knight [D]Rep. Dwight Loftis [R]Rep. Steven Long [R]
Rep. Phillip Lowe [R]Rep. James Lucas [R]Rep. Nancy Mace [R]Rep. David Mack [D]
Rep. Roy Magnuson [R]Rep. Richard Martin [R]Rep. Peter McCoy [R]Rep. John Mccravy [R]
Rep. Joseph McEachern [D]Rep. Timothy McGinnis [R]Rep. Cezar McKnight [D]Rep. Dennis Moss [R]
Rep. Steve Moss [R]Rep. Christopher Murphy [R]Rep. Brandon Newton [R]Rep. Weston Newton [R]
Rep. Mandy Norrell [D]Rep. Russell Ott [D]Rep. Anne Parks [D]Rep. Marvin Pendarvis [D]
Rep. Michael Pitts [R]Rep. Thomas Pope [R]Rep. Joshua Putnam [R]Rep. Robert Ridgeway [D]
Rep. Michael Rivers [D]Rep. Samuel Rivers [R]Rep. Leola Robinson-Simpson [D]Rep. Todd Rutherford [D]
Rep. William Sandifer [R]Rep. Gary Simrill [R]Rep. Murrell Smith [R]Rep. Garry Smith [R]
Rep. Michael Sottile [R]Rep. Kit Spires [R]Rep. Leonidas Stavrinakis [D]Rep. Tommy Stringer [R]
Rep. Edward Tallon [R]Rep. Bill Taylor [R]Rep. Anne Thayer [R]Rep. Ivory Thigpen [D]
Rep. McLain Toole [R]Rep. Ashley Trantham [R]Rep. David Weeks [D]Rep. John West [R]
Rep. William Wheeler [D]Rep. Brian White [R]Rep. William Whitmire [R]Rep. Robert Williams [D]
Rep. Mark Willis [R]Rep. Ronald Young [R]Rep. Richard Yow [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14SenateAdopted, returned to House with concurrence
2018-03-14SenateRecalled from Committee on General
2018-03-13SenateReferred to Committee on General
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced
2018-03-08HouseIntroduced, adopted, sent to Senate

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback