SC H5072 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 79-44)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Recognize And Express Deep Appreciation To The South Carolina Technical College System For Its Outstanding Contributions In Educating And Training Our State's Workforce And To Declare April 4, 2018, As "south Carolina Technical College System Day".
Title
SC Technical College System Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Education |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-03-07 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |