SC H5061 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-08 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-08 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The State Board Of Education, Relating To Minimum Standards Of Student Conduct And Disciplinary Enforcement Procedures To Be Implemented By Local School Districts, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4404, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Minimum standards of student conduct and disciplinary enforcement procedures to be implemented by local school districts (D. No. 4404)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-05-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-05-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-0 |
2014-05-06 | House | Read second time |
2014-04-10 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-6-14 |
2014-04-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S1266 (Similar To) 2014-05-15 - Recommitted to Committee on Education