SC H5049 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allow A Taxpayer To Appeal The Value Once Every Five Years And To Provide Exceptions.
Title
Property tax assessment appeals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-05-01 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-04-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-04-26 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 | |
2012-04-25 | Read second time | |
2012-04-25 | Amended | |
2012-04-25 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons | |
2012-04-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-04-19 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means | |
2012-03-21 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-03-21 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S1404 (Similar To) 2012-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 43 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 60 | 2510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 60 | 2530 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 60 | 2570 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 60 | 2580 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |