SC H5042 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 50-32)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Referred to Committee on Operations and Management
Pending: Senate Operations and Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Referred to Committee on Operations and Management
Pending: Senate Operations and Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 10-1-185 So As To Establish On The Grounds Of The State House A Robert Smalls Monument, Create A Commission To Determine The Design And Location Of The Monument, Provide For The Membership Of The Commission, And Sunset The Commission At A Date Certain.
Title
Robert Smalls Monument
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Operations and Management |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-22 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-21 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-03-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 |
2024-03-21 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley |
2024-03-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: O'Neal, B.Newton, Neese, Lawson, Atkinson, Hayes, Gatch, W.Newton, Bannister, Caskey, Hyde, J.E.Johnson, Hiott, Brittain, Hartnett, Mitchell, Yow, Gagnon, Carter, Guest, Crawford, Ott, Rutherford, Leber, Hixon, Herbkersman, Anderson, Bailey, Elliott, Gilliam, Calhoon, Wooten, Forrest, Pedalino, Jordan, Bustos, Bamberg, Bernstein, Clyburn, Hosey, Henderson-Myers, Howard, Vaughan, Beach |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-03-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.Moore |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-02-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0055 (Similar To) 2023-07-27 - Scrivener's error corrected