SC H5034 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-13 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Act 340 Of 1967, As Amended, Relating To The Charleston County School District, The Governing Body Thereof, And The Manner In Which Its Members Are Elected, So As To Revise The Areas From Which Board Members Are Elected.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charleston County School District

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 32) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-13 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-05-12SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2020-05-12SenateAmended
2020-03-12SenateRead second time
2020-02-05 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-02-04SenateIntroduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
2020-01-31HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2020-01-30 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-01-30HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-01-30HouseRoll call Yeas-86 Nays-0
2020-01-30HouseRead second time
2020-01-29HouseDelegation report: Favorable Charleston Delegation
2020-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hewitt
2020-01-28HouseReferred to Charleston Delegation
2020-01-28HouseIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback