SC H5030 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Signed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 12-28-2740, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Distribution Of Gasoline User Fees Among Counties And County Transportation Committees, So As To Provide For The Appointment Of Additional Members Of The Dorchester County Transportation Committee And The Manner Of Their Selection. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dorchester County Transportation Committee, membership increased

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 29) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-28 Signed By Governor
2020-09-25 Ratified R 189
2020-09-16SenateRead third time and enrolled
2020-09-15SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-09-15SenateRead second time
2020-09-15SenateCommittee report: Favorable Finance
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-02-11SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2020-02-06HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-02-06HouseRoll call Yeas-86 Nays-0
2020-02-06HouseRead second time
2020-02-05HouseDelegation report: Favorable Dorchester Delegation
2020-01-28HouseReferred to Dorchester Delegation
2020-01-28HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12282740(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback