SC H5024 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 290
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 290
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Require That Before The 2016-2017 School Year, The State Department Of Education Shall Provide All Literacy Coaches And Literacy Teachers In Kindergarten Through Third Grade With Training On Dyslexia And Related Disorders, Including Evidence-based Screenings, Instructional Methods, And Interventions, Among Other Things; And To Impose Related Reporting Requirements On The Department
Title
Literacy coaches and teachers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Act No. 290 | |
2016-06-01 | Effective date 05/26/16 | |
2016-05-26 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-05-24 | Ratified R 209 | |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Education |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-13 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2016-04-12 | House | Read second time |
2016-04-12 | House | Amended |
2016-03-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2016-03-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan |
2016-03-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: King, Felder, McCoy, Stavrinakis, Bannister, Hamilton, Henderson, Anthony |
2016-03-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Funderburk |
2016-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |