SC H5002 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 285
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Act No. 285
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriate Monies From The Capital Reserve Fund For Fiscal Year 2015-2016, And To Allow Unexpended Funds Appropriated To Be Carried Forward To Succeeding Fiscal Years And Expended For The Same Purposes
Title
Capital Reserve Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto 4 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto 3 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto 2 (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto 1 (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House: Veto 4-prt, Tourism Revitalization Override (Y: 93 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House: Veto 3-clemson, Garrison Arena Override (Y: 96 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House: Veto 2-patriots Point Dev. Override (Y: 93 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House: Veto 1-prt, Aquarium Override (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto 3 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto 2 (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto 1 (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House: Veto 4-prt, Tourism Revitalization Override (Y: 93 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House: Veto 3-clemson, Garrison Arena Override (Y: 96 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House: Veto 2-patriots Point Dev. Override (Y: 93 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House: Veto 1-prt, Aquarium Override (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Act No. 285 | |
2016-06-27 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Veto overridden on certain items: 1-4 |
2016-06-15 | House | Veto overridden on certain items: 1-4 |
2016-06-08 | Certain items vetoed by Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 276 | |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2016-06-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-114 Nays-1 |
2016-06-01 | House | Conference report received and adopted |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-4 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Conference report adopted |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Leatherman, Sheheen, Davis |
2016-05-24 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Hosey, White, Herbkersman |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2016-05-19 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 |
2016-05-19 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2016-05-19 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2016-05-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-34 Nays-4 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-3 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Amended |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-03-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-03-23 | House | Roll call Yeas-114 Nays-0 |
2016-03-23 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2016-03-22 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-22 | House | Amended |
2016-03-17 | House | Special order, set for immediately following 2nd reading of H. 5001 |
2016-03-16 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 3-17-16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-16-16 |
2016-03-10 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-15-16 |
2016-03-09 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |