SC H5000 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 200
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 200
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 44-63-140, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating In Part To The Right Of Adult Adopted Persons To Access Their Original Birth Certificates In Certain Circumstances, So As To Apply Retroactively; And For Other Purposes. - Ratified Title
Title
Original birth certificates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Act No. 200 | |
2022-05-31 | Effective date 05/16/23 | |
2022-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-12 | Ratified R 226 | |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-5 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-01 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-03-31 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2022-03-31 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2022-03-31 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-31 | House | Amended |
2022-03-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: May |
2022-03-30 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4566 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary