SC H5000 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Recommitted to Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Recommitted to Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Rename The Program The "defined Contribution Primary Retirement Plan" (dcprp), To Provide For A Default Vendor And Investment Option, To Provide Selection Criteria For Vendors, To Provide Responsibilities For Vendors, To Provide For The Length Of Vendor Contracts, To Provide For The Number Of Vendors That The Public Employee Benefit Authority May Contract With, To Provide That At Least One Vendor Offers Fixed Rate And Variable Annuities, To Provide That A Member May Not Borrow Against His Dcprp, To Provide For Vesting Requirements, To Provide For Employer And Employee Contribution Rates, To Provide That Certain Education Must Be Offered To Members, And To Provide That A Class Two Or Class Three Member May Choose To Become A Class Four Member.
Title
Retirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House: Table Motion To Recommit (Y: 13 N: 90 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-04-26 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-1-18 |
2018-04-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-04-19 | House | Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |