SC H4989 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of Mccarter Road In Greenville County From Its Intersection With South Carolina Highway 14 To Its Intersection With Interstate Highway 385 "edward Charles 'eddie' Case Memorial Boulevard" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway Containing This Designation.
Title
Edward Charles "Eddie" Case Memorial Boulevard
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Willis [R] | Rep. Garry Smith [R] | Rep. Daniel Hamilton [R] | Rep. Michael Pitts [R] |
Rep. Ashley Trantham [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-03-22 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2018-03-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-02-21 | House | Introduced |