SC H4940 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-09 - Act No. 187
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establish The Electricity Market Reform Measures Study Committee, To Provide For The Study Committee's Membership And The Committee's Affiliated Nonvoting Advisory Board, To Provide That The Committee Shall Study Whether To Recommend The Adoption Of Various Electricity Market Reform Measures Affecting The Provision Of Electric Service In South Carolina And The Potential Public Benefits Associated With These Measures, To Require The Study Committee To Issue A Report With Findings And Recommendations, To Require The Study Committee To Retain A Third-party, Independent, Expert Consultant, Or Consultants, To Advise The Study Committee, And To Provide For The Dissolution Of The Study Committee. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electricity Market Reform Measures Study Committee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-23 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 99 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House: Table Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 71 N: 35 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 81 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-09 Act No. 187
2020-10-07 Effective date 09/29/20
2020-09-29 Signed By Governor
2020-09-25 Ratified R 186
2020-09-23HouseRoll call Yeas-99 Nays-11
2020-09-23HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2020-09-22 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-09-17SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2020-09-16SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-09-16SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2020-09-16SenateRead second time
2020-09-16SenateAmended
2020-09-15SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-02SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Gambrell (ch), Hutto, Sabb, Climer, Goldfinch
2020-02-19SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-19SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-02-13HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2020-02-13 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-02-12HouseRoll call Yeas-81 Nays-31
2020-02-12HouseRead second time
2020-02-12HouseAmended
2020-02-12HouseRequests for debate-Rep(s). Brawley
2020-02-12HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Norrell, Funderburk
2020-02-11HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2020-02-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole
2020-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Ott, West
2020-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2020-01-15HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0998 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Referred to Subcommittee: Gambrell (ch), Hutto, Sabb, Climer, Goldfinch

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4940&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4940_20200115.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4940_20200211.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4940_20200212.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4940_20200213.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4940_20200915.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4940_20200916.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4940_20200922.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17222
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17866
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=18071
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=18072

Bill Comments 750

feedback