SC H4938 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Signed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 44-53-360, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating In Part To Electronic Prescriptions, So As To Add Certain Exceptions To Electronic Prescribing Requirements And To Make Technical Corrections. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic prescriptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-22 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 27) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-28 Signed By Governor
2020-09-25 Ratified R 185
2020-09-22HouseRoll call Yeas-108 Nays-0
2020-09-22HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2020-09-17SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2020-09-16SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-09-16SenateRoll call Ayes-40 Nays-1
2020-09-16SenateRead second time
2020-09-16SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2020-09-15SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
2020-03-04SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2020-03-04SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-03-04HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2020-03-04 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-03-03HouseRoll call Yeas-95 Nays-0
2020-03-03HouseRead second time
2020-03-03HouseAmended
2020-02-26HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 2-27-20
2020-02-24 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-02-20HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2020-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2020-01-15HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4453360(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4938&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4938_20200115.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4938_20200220.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4938_20200224.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4938_20200303.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4938_20200304.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4938_20200915.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4938_20200916.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17282
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17855
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17926

Bill Comments

feedback