SC H4933 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That The State Interest Shall Prevail If A Conflict Exists Between The Antitrust Laws Of The State Or The United States And The Exercise Of Power By A Regional Health Services District With Respect To The Ownership, Operation, Management, Or Lease Of A Hospital, Health Care Facility, Or Other Exercise Of Power.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional Health Services Board of Directors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2018-03-27SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-03-23HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2018-03-22HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2018-03-22HouseRoll call Yeas-98 Nays-0
2018-03-22HouseRead second time
2018-03-21HouseCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2018-02-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss
2018-02-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Anthony, Long, Chumley, Henderson-Myers, Magnuson
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-14HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S1014 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Act No. 154

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4472060(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback