SC H4929 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Bridge On Wateree Road Where It Crosses The Wateree Creek "jerry Nealy Bridge" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing The Designation.
Title
Fairfield County; Jerry Nealy Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-02-20 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced |
Same As/Similar To
S0661 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Rejected