SC H4913 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 228
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 228
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designate The Second Saturday Of November Of Each Year As "penn Center Heritage Day" In South Carolina
Title
Penn Center Heritage Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 228 | |
2018-05-25 | Effective date 05/18/18 | |
2018-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 270 | |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable General |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-04-06 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-04-05 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2018-04-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0 |
2018-04-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-04-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McEachern, Bowers, Bradley, Govan |
2018-04-04 | House | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-03-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |