SC H4906 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Act No. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Act No. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 50-11-105, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Wildlife Disease Control, So As To Allow The Department Of Natural Resources To Take Action Regarding Wildlife Disease Control. - Ratified Title
Title
Wildlife Disease Control
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-15 | Act No. 136 | |
2022-04-15 | Effective date 04/11/22 | |
2022-04-11 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-04-07 | Ratified R 146 | |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-02-24 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |