SC H4906 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Act No. 320
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Act No. 320
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extend The Deadline For The Veterans' Issues Study Committee To Submit Its Written Report From January 31, 2012, To January 31, 2016
Title
Veteran's Issue Study Committee
Sponsors
Rep. James Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-05 | Act No. 320 | |
2012-05-17 | Effective date 05/14/12 | |
2012-05-14 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-05-08 | Ratified R 197 | |
2012-05-02 | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 | |
2012-05-02 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled | |
2012-05-01 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments | |
2012-04-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-04-26 | Roll call Ayes-35 Nays-0 | |
2012-04-26 | Read second time | |
2012-04-26 | Amended | |
2012-04-25 | Committee report: Favorable General | |
2012-04-25 | Polled out of committee General | |
2012-03-06 | Referred to Committee on General | |
2012-03-06 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-03-01 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 | |
2012-02-29 | Read second time | |
2012-02-28 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |