SC H4905 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Act No. 314
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Act No. 314
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [HTML]
Summary
Require Local School Districts To Decide And Notify Teachers Of Their Employment For The 2012-2013 School Year By May 15, 2012; To Provide That A Continuing-contract Teacher Who Is Being Recommended For Formal Evaluation The Following School Year Must Be Notified In Writing On Or Before The Date The School District Issues The Written Offer Of Employment Or Reemployment; To Require Teachers Who Are Reemployed By Written Notification To Notify The District Board Of Their Acceptance Within Ten Days Of Receipt Of Written Notification Of Employment; And To Allow Districts To Uniformly Negotiate Salaries Of Certain Retired Teachers Below The District Salary Schedule
Title
Teacher employment notification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-05 | Act No. 314 | |
2012-04-25 | Effective date 04/14/12 | |
2012-04-14 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-04-13 | Ratified R 165 | |
2012-04-12 | Read third time and enrolled | |
2012-04-12 | Amended | |
2012-04-11 | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 | |
2012-04-11 | Read second time | |
2012-04-11 | Amended | |
2012-03-29 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference | |
2012-03-29 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2012-03-28 | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 | |
2012-03-28 | Read second time | |
2012-03-22 | Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-02-28 | Introduced and read first time |