SC H4889 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 196
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 196
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 40-79-215 So As To Prohibit An Alarm Business Or Contractor From Being Fined For A False Alarm Not Attributed To Improper Installation, Defective Equipment, Or Operational Error By The Alarm Business Or Contractor. - Ratified Title
Title
Alarm System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Act No. 196 | |
2022-05-31 | Effective date 05/16/22 | |
2022-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-12 | Ratified R 222 | |
2022-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2022-05-12 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Amended |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Amended |
2022-04-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Polled out of committee Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-03-30 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-03-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-1 |
2022-03-29 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced and read first time |