SC H4882 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 76-47)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Roll call Yeas-81 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-21 - Roll call Yeas-81 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize Palmetto Boys State To Use The Chambers Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate, At A Date And Time To Be Mutually Agreed Upon By The Speaker And The President Pro Tempore, For Its Annual State House Meeting.
Title
Palmetto Boys State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Roll call Yeas-81 Nays-0 | |
2012-03-21 | Concurred in amendment | |
2012-03-07 | Returned to House with amendments | |
2012-03-07 | Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Amended | |
2012-03-06 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations | |
2012-03-06 | Polled out of committee Invitations | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to Committee on Invitations | |
2012-02-28 | Introduced | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |