SC H4877 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revise The Membership By Designating One Additional Seat For A Member Who Is A Pyrotechnic Retailer And Eliminating One Seat Designated For A Member Of The General Public.
Title
Pyrotechnic safety board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-21 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-03-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2018-03-20 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |