SC H4877 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-14 - Act No. 253
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-14 - Act No. 253
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Add Two Additional Family Court Judges Who Shall Be At Large And Must Be Elected Without Regard To Their County Or Circuit Of Residence
Title
Family court judges
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Delleney [R] | Rep. Michael Pitts [R] | Rep. James Lucas [R] | Rep. Bruce Bannister [R] |
Rep. Jackson Whipper [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 6 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 6 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Act No. 253 | |
2016-06-14 | Effective date 06/07/16 | |
2016-06-07 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 270 | |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-21 Nays-18 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-15 Nays-24 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Second Reading Failed |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Reconsider vote whereby read second time |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-6 Nays-35 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Second Reading Failed |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Malloy, Massey |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-03-17 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-03-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-0 |
2016-03-16 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |