SC H4870 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Act No. 150
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Act No. 150
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Add One Precinct, And Redesignate The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office
Title
Voting precincts, Lancaster County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 45 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 45 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Act No. 150 | |
2018-04-06 | Effective date 04/04/18 | |
2018-04-04 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-04-03 | Ratified R 158 | |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-02-08 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2018-02-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-77 Nays-0 |
2018-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |