SC H4867 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Adams, Garrett, Gustafson, Tedder
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Adams, Garrett, Gustafson, Tedder
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 23-23-45 So As To Require All 911 Telecommunicators Who Provide Dispatch For Emergency Medical Conditions To Be Trained In High-quality Telecommunicator Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation (t-cpr).
Title
Telecommunicator CPR Training Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Adams, Garrett, Gustafson, Tedder |
2024-04-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-03-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0 |
2024-03-28 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-28 | House | Amended |
2024-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-02-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bauer |
2024-02-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sandifer, J.E.Johnson, Brittain |
2024-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hart |
2024-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey, M.M.Smith |
2024-01-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.L.Cox |
2024-01-18 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hiott, Blackwell |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0976 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary