SC H4844 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 79-44)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declare February 26 Through March 4, 2018, As "eating Disorders Awareness Week" In The State Of South Carolina To Coincide With National Eating Disorders Awareness Week And To Declare Thursday, March 1, 2018, As "eating Disorders Awareness Day" In South Carolina.
Title
Eating Disorder Awareness Week
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2018-02-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |