SC H4836 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Roll call Yeas-50 Nays-62
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Roll call Yeas-50 Nays-62
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That If A Dam Which Failed Or Suffered A Breach Between October 1, 2015, And October 15, 2015, Has A Public Road Or Highway In The State Highway System Running Across The Top Of It And Has Not Been Repaired Or Is Not Currently Under Repair, The Department Of Transportation Shall Proceed Immediately With The Process Of Repairing The Public Road Or Highway Atop The Dam, If Suitable Rights Of Way Or Easements Afford The State Or The Department Of Transportation The Right To Do So Without The Necessity Of Saving Or Repairing The Dam, And To Provide That If Suitable Rights Of Way Or Easements Do Not Exist Over Which The Public Road Or Highway Shall Be Constructed, The Department Of Transportation Shall Begin The Process Of Acquiring Them By All Available Lawful Means So That The Public Road Or Highway Can Be Put Back Into Service For The Use Of The General Public As Soon As Possible.
Title
Dams
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 50 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-50 Nays-62 |
2018-04-04 | House | Rejected |
2018-03-01 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-6-18 |
2018-02-22 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2018-02-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Williams |
2018-02-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Atwater |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |