SC H4831 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Norrell, Mitchell
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Norrell, Mitchell
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increase The Penalties For Solicitation Of Prostitution, Establishing Or Keeping A Brothel Or House Of Prostitution, Or Causing Or Inducing Another To Participate In Prostitution; To Establish An Affirmative Defense For A Victim Of Human Trafficking; And To Further Increase The Penalties For Soliciting, Causing, Or Inducing Another For Prostitution When The Prostitute Has A Mental Disability; And To Repeal Section 16-15-110 Relating To Penalties For Violations Of Prostitution Offenses.
Title
Prostitution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Norrell, Mitchell |
2016-03-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Tallon |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-03 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0986 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 15 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 15 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 15 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4831&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4831_20160203.htm |