SC H4821 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-09 - Act No. 269
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-09 - Act No. 269
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide For The Filing Of Court Documents By Electronic Means From An Integrated Electronic Filing (e-filing) System And To Provide That Fees Generated From E-filing Are To Be Used In Support Of Court Technology
Title
Filing of court documents by electronic means created
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-09 | Act No. 269 | |
2012-07-02 | Effective date 06/20/12 | |
2012-06-20 | Veto overridden Ayes-39 Nays-3 | |
2012-06-19 | Veto overridden by originating body Yeas-93 Nays-14 | |
2012-06-11 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2012-06-06 | Ratified R 258 | |
2012-06-05 | Read third time and enrolled | |
2012-05-31 | Roll call Ayes-34 Nays-0 | |
2012-05-31 | Read second time | |
2012-05-30 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary | |
2012-04-27 | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Bright, Davis | |
2012-04-25 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-25 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-04-25 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2012-04-24 | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 | |
2012-04-24 | Read second time | |
2012-03-28 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced and read first time |