SC H4821 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-04 - Referred to Committee on Transportation SJ-16
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-04 - Referred to Committee on Transportation SJ-16
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 56-3-2330, AS AMENDED, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO MANUFACTURER LICENSE PLATES FOR MOTOR VEHICLES, SO AS TO INCREASE FROM FOUR TO FIVE HUNDRED THE NUMBER OF THESE PLATES THAT MAY BE ISSUED TO A MANUFACTURER AND TO INCREASE FROM TEN TO TWENTY DAYS THE MAXIMUM NUMBER OF CONSECUTIVE DAYS THAT VEHICLES WITH THESE PLATES MAY BE USED IN CONNECTION WITH CIVIC AND SPORTING EVENTS.
Title
Increase From Four To Five Hundred The Number Of These Plates That May Be Issued To A Manufacturer And To Increase From Ten To Twenty Days The Maximum Number Of Consecutive Days That Vehicles With These Plates May Be Used In Connection With Civic And Sporting Events.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Referred to Committee on Transportation SJ-16 | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced and read first time SJ-16 | |
2010-04-29 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-26 | |
2010-04-28 | Read second time HJ-37 | |
2010-04-22 | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-38 | |
2010-04-13 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-60 | |
2010-04-13 | Introduced and read first time HJ-60 |
Same As/Similar To
S1328 (Similar To) 2010-06-09 - Act No. 188
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4821&session=118 |