SC H4820 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-08 - Act No. 311
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-08 - Act No. 311
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establish And Reapportion These Election Districts
Title
Clover School District 2
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Norman [R] | Rep. John King [D] | Rep. Deborah Long [R] | Rep. Dennis Moss [R] |
Rep. Gregory Delleney [R] | Rep. Raye Felder [R] | Rep. Steve Moss [R] | Rep. Thomas Pope [R] |
Rep. Gary Simrill [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 58) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 58) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-08 | Act No. 311 | |
2014-04-21 | Effective date 04/14/14 | |
2014-04-14 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-04-10 | Ratified R 173 | |
2014-04-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-82 Nays-0 |
2014-04-09 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-03-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Amended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-03-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-64 Nays-0 |
2014-03-05 | House | Read second time |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |