SC H4817 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Adams, Garrett, Gustafson
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Adams, Garrett, Gustafson
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 16-17-500, Relating To The Sale Or Purchase Of Tobacco Products To Minors Without Proof Of Age And The Location Of Vending Machines, So As To Include Alternative Nicotine Products And To Require Individuals Seeking To Purchase Tobacco Products Or Alternative Nicotine Products To Present Proof Of Age Upon Demand, And To Allow The Purchase Of Tobacco Products And Alternative Nicotine Products From Vending Machines In Certain Establishments.
Title
Tobacco products, sale or purchase by minors
Sponsors
Rep. John West [R] | Rep. Murrell Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 87 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Adams, Garrett, Gustafson |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-13 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Debate adjourned until Mon., 3-11-24 |
2024-03-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-87 Nays-21 |
2024-03-06 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0904 (Similar To) 2024-01-09 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary