SC H4798 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-11 - Referred to Subcommittee: Cleary (ch), Ford, S.Martin
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-11 - Referred to Subcommittee: Cleary (ch), Ford, S.Martin
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING SECTION 1-1-611 SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT THE HONOR AND REMEMBER FLAG IS THE OFFICIAL STATE FLAG TO HONOR FALLEN SOLDIERS.
Title
Provide That The Honor And Remember Flag Is The Official State Flag To Honor Fallen Soldiers.
Sponsors
Rep. Anton Gunn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Referred to Subcommittee: Cleary (ch), Ford, S.Martin | |
2010-05-04 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-16 | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced and read first time SJ-16 | |
2010-04-30 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-2 | |
2010-04-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-04-29 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day HJ-53 | |
2010-04-29 | Read second time HJ-53 | |
2010-04-28 | Recalled from Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-48 | |
2010-04-13 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-16 | |
2010-04-13 | Introduced and read first time HJ-16 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4798&session=118 |