SC H4791 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-06 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That An Entity May Not Search An Electronic Device Without A Search Warrant, To Provide Exceptions, And To Provide Certain Notice Requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Data Privacy Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-06SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2014-05-06SenateIntroduced and read first time
2014-05-01HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2014-04-30HouseRoll call Yeas-89 Nays-17
2014-04-30HouseRead second time
2014-04-30HouseAmended
2014-04-29HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 4-30-14
2014-04-10HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 4-29-14
2014-04-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2014-04-03HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2014-04-02HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2014-02-26HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2014-02-26HouseIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback