SC H4775 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Act No. 234
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Act No. 234
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Chapter 60 Of Title 48, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Manufacturer Responsibility For The Recovery And Recycling Of Certain Electronic Waste, So As To Add And Change Definitional Terms; To Require Manufacturers Of Covered Devices To Offer An Electronic Waste Program And To Establish Minimum Requirements Of Such Programs, Including Population-based County Collection Site Standards; To Require Manufacturers To Register With And Submit An Annual Manufacturer Electronic Waste Program Plan To The Department Of Health And Environmental Control For Review And Approval And To Establish Minimum Plan Requirements; To Allow Manufacturer Clearinghouses To Act On Behalf Of Certain Manufacturers; To Establish Certain Requirements For Collectors And Recoverers; To Set Forth Powers And Duties Of The Department Of Health And Environmental Control; To Create Civil And Criminal Penalties For Certain Violations Of The Chapter; To Provide For Periodic Review Of The Chapter's Provisions By A Stakeholder Group; And For Other Purposes; And To Repeal Section 14 Of Act 129 Of 2014, As Amended, Relating To A Sunset Provision. - Ratified Title
Title
Electronics recycling
Sponsors
Rep. Davey Hiott [R] | Rep. William Bailey [R] | Rep. Jerry Carter [R] | Rep. Shannon Erickson [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Bradley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Act No. 234 | |
2022-06-28 | Effective date 06/17/22 | |
2022-06-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-06-16 | Ratified R 268 | |
2022-06-15 | House | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2022-06-15 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2022-06-15 | House | Conference report received and adopted |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Conference report received and adopted |
2022-05-12 | House | Conference committee appointed Hixon, Forrest, Atkinson |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Talley, Kimbrell, Stephens |
2022-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-100 |
2022-05-12 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-2 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Amended |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Polled out of committee Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-04-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-0 |
2022-04-06 | House | Read second time |
2022-04-06 | House | Amended |
2022-04-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley |
2022-04-05 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-03-31 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |