SC H4765 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide Public Schools And Public School Districts May Not Use Debt Collection Agencies To Collect Or Attempt To Collect Outstanding Debts On Student School Lunch Or Breakfast Accounts, To Provide Public Schools And Public School Districts May Not Assess Or Collect Any Interest, Fees, Or Other Such Monetary Penalties For Outstanding Debts For Student School Lunch Or Breakfast Accounts, And To Provide The Provisions Of This Act Apply To Debts On Student Lunch And Breakfast Accounts Outstanding On The Effective Date Of This Act And Incurred After The Effective Date Of This Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School lunch debt

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseCommittee report: Favorable Education and Public Works
2020-02-12HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins, Kimmons, Bernstein
2020-02-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan, McDaniel
2020-01-30HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Thigpen
2020-01-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Alexander, Brown
2020-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham
2020-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-12-11HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2019-12-11HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5963785(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback