SC H4760 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 59-18-310, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Statewide Assessment Program To Promote Student Learning And Student Performance, So As To Remove Social Studies From Among The Subjects Assessed In Third Grade Through Eighth Grade, To Provide Specific Diagnostic Information That The Assessments Must Include, And To Provide Certain Related Information That Districts And Schools Shall Provide Parents Or Guardians Of Students Being Assessed; And To Amend Section 59-18-325, Relating To The Procurement Of Standards-based Assessments By The State Department Of Education, So As To Provide That Beginning With The 2021-2022 School Year The Department Must Embed Items To Address Certain Social Studies Standards On The Sc Ready Reading And Writing Assessments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide assessments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2020-01-30SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-01-30HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2020-01-29HouseRoll call Yeas-111 Nays-4
2020-01-29HouseRead second time
2020-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bales
2020-01-29HouseRequests for debate removed-Rep(s). Brown, Bryant, Burns, Chumley, Clyburn, Elliott, Forrest, Garvin, Gilliard, Henegan, Hiott, Hosey, Jefferson, Jones, Magnuson, McCravy, Norrell, Rose, S Williams, Toole, Trantham, Whitmire
2020-01-28HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2020-01-28HouseAmended
2020-01-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McGinnis
2020-01-23HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Trantham
2020-01-22HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
2020-01-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Calhoon
2020-01-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow
2020-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham, Felder
2020-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-12-11HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2019-12-11HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0588 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Referred to Committee on Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5918310(n/a)See Bill Text
5918325(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback