SC H4759 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Direct The State Department Of Education To Develop A Technology Plan For Providing Wireless Internet Access In All Public Schools And Further Direct The Department To Provide A Report Of Its Plan To The Speaker Of The House Of Representatives And The President Of The Senate Before August 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WiFi; DOE to develop technology plan for providing wifi on all public school buses and other provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham
2020-01-15HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis
2020-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-12-11HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2019-12-11HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback