SC H4758 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 59-25-25 So As To Provide Educator Preparation Programs Within Institutions Of Higher Education May Submit Separate And Distinct Educator Preparation Programs For Alternative Preparation To The State Board Of Education For Approval, To Provide These Programs Are Not Required To Be Nationally Accredited But Must Meet Certain Other Requirements, And To Provide The State Department Of Education Annually Shall Report Related Data To The State Board Of Education And The General Assembly; And By Adding Section 59-26-120 So As To Provide The Department Shall Provide Certain Educator Preparation Programs With Certain Information Regarding Graduates Of Those Programs, To Provide Educator Preparation Programs May Not Share Identifiable Educator Data With Third Parties Without Written Consent, And To Provide This Information Is Not Subject To The Freedom Of Information Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Educator preparation programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-02-27HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2020-02-26HouseRoll call Yeas-108 Nays-1
2020-02-26HouseRead second time
2020-02-26HouseAmended
2020-02-20HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
2020-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham, Felder
2020-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-12-11HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2019-12-11HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3577 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Education
H3578 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Stringer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
592525(n/a)See Bill Text
5926120(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback