SC H4741 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers, Thigpen
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers, Thigpen
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 15-41-30, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Property Exempt From Attachment, Levy, And Sale, So As To Provide That A Debtor's Interest In Real Property Used As A Primary Residence May Not Be Sold If The Action Was Instituted By A Homeowners Association Attempting To Collect Unpaid Dues, Fees, Or Fines; To Amend Section 27-30-130, Relating To The Enforceability Of A Homeowners Association's Governing Documents, So As To Prohibit The Enforceability Of A Provision Granting A Homeowners Association The Authority To Foreclose On Property; And By Adding Section 29-3-810 So As To Prohibit A Foreclosure Action Not Authorized By Statute.
Title
Foreclosure
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Rutherford [D] | Rep. Leola Robinson-Simpson [D] | Rep. William Clyburn [D] | Rep. Wendy Brawley [D] |
Rep. Rosalyn Henderson-Myers [D] | Rep. Ivory Thigpen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers, Thigpen |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-11-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-11-20 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S1116 (Similar To) 2020-02-19 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 41 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
27 | 30 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 3 | 810 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4741&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4741_20191120.htm |