SC H4727 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 224
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 224
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize The Bank To Award Additional Grant Funds To Certain Agencies For The Acquisition Of Fee Simple Title To Land And To Establish Application And Reporting Requirements; To Repeal Section 12-24-95 And 12-24-97 Both Relating To The Portion Of The Deed Recording Fee Credited To The South Carolina Conservation Bank Trust Fund; To Repeal Section 27-8-120 Relating To The Repeal Of The South Carolina Conservation Bank; To Repeal Section 48-59-75 Relating To The Restriction Of Deed Recording Fees To The Trust Fund; And To Repeal Sections 3, 4, 5, And 7 Of Act 200 Of 2002 Relating To The Requirement To Periodically Reauthorize The South Carolina Conservation Bank Trust Fund
Title
Conservation Bank Trust Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Free Conference Report (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Adopt Free Conference Report (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 20 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Adopt Free Conference Report (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 20 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 224 | |
2018-05-25 | Effective date 07/01/18 | |
2018-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 266 | |
2018-05-10 | House | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2018-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | House | Free conference report adopted |
2018-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | House | Free conference powers granted |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Free conference report adopted |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Free conference committee appointed Setzler, Campsen, Campbell |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Free conference powers granted |
2018-05-08 | House | Conference committee appointed White, Lowe, Hosey |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Setzler, Campsen, Campbell |
2018-05-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-97 |
2018-05-03 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2018-05-01 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-2-18 |
2018-04-25 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-1-18 |
2018-04-17 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-24-18 |
2018-04-04 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-17-18 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-03-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Amended |
2018-03-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2018-02-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-02-14 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-3 |
2018-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-14 | House | Amended |
2018-02-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott, S.Rivers |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2018-02-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Lowe |
2018-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton, J.E.Smith, Rutherford, Bernstein, W.Newton, Herbkersman, McCoy |
2018-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis, Clary |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-01-25 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 24 | 95 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 24 | 97 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
27 | 8 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
48 | 59 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
48 | 59 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
48 | 59 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
48 | 59 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
48 | 59 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
48 | 59 | 75 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |