SC H4724 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-09 - Act No. 186
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-09 - Act No. 186
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establish The Committee To Study Veteran Homelessness, Unemployment, Job Placement, Incidence Of Post-traumatic Stress Disorder, Access To Basic Human Services, And Other Issues Affecting South Carolina Veterans And To Provide For Related Matters Including, But Not Limited To, Committee Membership And Duties, The Filling Of Vacancies, Committee Meetings, And Staffing. - Ratified Title
Title
Veteran Study Committee created to study veteran homelessness
Sponsors
Rep. Wendell Gilliard [D] | Rep. William Clyburn [D] | Rep. Lonnie Hosey [D] | Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D] |
Rep. Robert Williams [D] | Rep. John King [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-15 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 21 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 21 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-09 | Act No. 186 | |
2020-10-02 | Effective date 09/28/20 | |
2020-09-28 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-09-25 | Ratified R 183 | |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Family and Veterans' Services |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Polled out of committee Family and Veterans' Services |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2020-03-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-03-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-2 |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-03-03 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2020-03-03 | House | Amended |
2020-03-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: King |
2020-02-26 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-27-20 |
2020-02-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, R.Williams |
2020-02-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-11-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2019-11-20 | House | Prefiled |